IL HR0156 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Consumer Protection and Financial Bureau to adopt regulations to implement Section 1071 of the Dodd-Frank Wall Street Reform and Consumer Protection Act as expeditiously as possible.
Title
DODD-FRANK REGULATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-08-09 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-05-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-03-28 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=156&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0156.htm |