IL HR0149 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-15 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares August of 2023 as Illinois Nature Preserve Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
IL NATURE PRESERVE MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-15 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2023-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2023-05-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2023-04-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000 |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2023-04-11 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeff Keicher |