IL HR0121 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges every Illinois municipality that utilizes lead service lines to develop a plan to minimize the risk of lead exposure to its residents by developing a plan consisting of short and long-term steps to fully eliminate lead pipes from its drinking water systems.
Title
LEAD SERVICE LINES
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Sonya Harper [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=121&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0121.htm |