IL HR0050 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Success by 25 Task Force under the Department of Children and Family Services.
Title
SUCCESS BY 25 TSK FRCE
Sponsors
Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] |
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - Motion in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-15 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 110-000-000 |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2017-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2017-02-16 | House | Recommends Be Adopted as Amended Human Services Committee; 011-001-000 |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |