IL HR0038 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requests that the State of Illinois Central Management Services' Business Enterprise Program Council include the equity ownership of silent investors of the same special classification in the calculations of the majority ownership of a company and to include silent investor equity when calculating control of a company when the silent investors have given controlling authority to one or more persons of that classification.
Title
CMS BEC EQUITY CALCULATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Martwick |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=38&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HR/09800HR0038.htm |