IL HR0022 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares February 2021 as Black Nurses Month in Illinois.
Title
BLACK NURSES MONTH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Resolution Adopted 099-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day |
2021-04-15 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day |
2021-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2021-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |