IL HR0020 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges restitution be paid to the victim before any court or law imposed cost, fine, fee, assessment, or other payment by the defendant is paid.
Title
RESTITUTION TO VICTIM FIRST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-02-19 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-01-07 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=20&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0020.htm |