IL HR0020 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President Obama and the Congress to allocate $2 billion of the next proposed economic stimulus to create a youth employment program.
Title
ECON STIMULUS-YOUTH EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-22 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2009-04-22 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2009-04-22 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-04-22 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2009-04-22 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2009-04-22 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin | |
2009-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2009-02-10 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2009-02-10 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2009-02-10 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2009-02-10 | Recommends Be Adopted Labor Committee; 014-003-000 | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Labor Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-01-21 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Cynthia Soto |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=20&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0020.htm |