IL HJR0085 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Shows support for the application of evidence-based multi-stakeholder endorsed (National Quality Forum) quality measures and requirements that health plans and providers report publicly on quality performance to improve patient outcomes and better inform patient choices in state Health Insurance Marketplaces and state-funded healthcare programs, including Medicaid.
Title
NQF QUALITY MEASURES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2014-04-07 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2014-03-20 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=85&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HJR/09800HJ0085.htm |