IL HJR0040 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

RESOLVED, BY THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE ONE HUNDRED FIRST GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE SENATE CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, February 21, 2019, the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Tuesday, February 26, 2019, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Wednesday, February 27, 2019, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Thursday, February 28, 2019, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 5, 2019, or until the call of the Speaker; and the Senate stands adjourned until Tuesday, March 05, 2019, or until the call of the President.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21HouseAdopted Both Houses
2019-02-21SenateResolution Adopted
2019-02-21SenatePrevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a)
2019-02-21SenateMoved to Suspend Rule Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford; 3-6(a)
2019-02-21SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-02-21SenateArrive in Senate
2019-02-20HouseResolution Adopted
2019-02-20HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback