IL HJR0003 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes application to Congress under the provisions of Article V of the Constitution of the United States for the calling of a convention of the states limited to proposing amendments to the Constitution of the United States that impose fiscal restraints on the federal government, limit the power and jurisdiction of the federal government, and limit the terms of office for its officials and for members of Congress.
Title
US CONST-ART V-APPLICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2023-06-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2023-05-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2023-05-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2023-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2023-04-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe C. Sosnowski |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William E Hauter |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy L. Grant |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jed Davis |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Bunting |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin Schmidt |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Swanson |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2023-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2023-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HJR/10300HJ0003.htm |