IL HB6315 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Task Force on Inventorying Employment Restrictions Act of 2016. Reconstitutes the Task Force on Inventorying Employment Restrictions in the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority. Provides that for each occupation under specified State agency jurisdiction for which there are employment restrictions based on criminal records, each State agency must provide the Task Force with a report, on or before November 1, 2016 and each even-numbered year thereafter, for the previous 2-year period, setting forth certain information concerning job titles, the statutory or regulatory authority for the restrictions, and other information required by the Act. Provides that on or before September 1, 2017 and each subsequent odd-numbered year, all State agencies shall produce a report for the Task Force that describes the employment restrictions that are based on criminal records for each occupation under the agency's jurisdiction and that of its boards, if any. Provides that the Task Force shall report to the Governor and the General Assembly its findings, including recommendations as to any employment restrictions that are not reasonably related to public safety, before January 1 of each even-numbered year beginning in 2018. Repeals the Task Force on Inventorying Employment Restrictions Act. Deletes provisions from this Act that were in the previous Act that stated that the provisions of the Act are subject to resources being made available to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority to implement the Act. Effective immediately.
Title
TASK FORCE-EMPLOYMENT RESTRICT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 5000 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6315&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6315.htm |