IL HB6315 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that for each rule proposed to be adopted by the State Board of Education impacting the operations of any school district, any interested person may request the Joint Committee on Administrative Rules to determine whether the proposed rule is a State mandate. If the Joint Committee determines that the proposed rule is a State mandate, then the running of all periods under the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act shall be tolled, and no Certificate of No Objection may be issued for the rule, until the rule has been approved by a joint resolution of the General Assembly.
Title
ISBE-RULES-UNFUNDED MANDATES
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Ronald Sandack [R] | Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R] |
Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-11-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2014-11-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-11-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-11-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-11-06 | House | First Reading |
2014-11-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-11-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-11-05 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-11-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6315&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB6315.htm |