IL HB6278 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Historic Preservation Agency Act. Expands the list of State Historic Sites to include (i) Apple River Fort State Historic Site, Jo Daviess County; (ii) the Crenshaw House State Historic Site, Gallatin County; (iii) the Lewis and Clark State Historic Site, Madison County; (iv) the Martin Boismenue House State Historic Site, St. Clair County; and (v) the World War II Memorial, Sangamon County. Changes the name of the Amistad Commission to the Amistad and Freedom Trail Commission. Requires the Commission to prepare a master plan to promote and preserve the history of the African slave trade, slavery in America, the vestiges of slavery in this country, the freedom trail and underground railroad in the State, and the contributions of African-Americans to our society. Requires the Commission (i) to assist in developing partnerships to seek public and private funds to carry out events memorializing the freedom trail and underground railroad and (ii) to assist in and promote the making of applications for inclusion in the National Park Service's National Underground Railroad Network to Freedom Program. Makes changes to provisions concerning Commission members; the administration of the Lincoln Presidential Library; and the Office of the Internal Auditor of the Historic Preservation Agency. Repeals a provision creating the Freedom Trail Commission. Amends the Illinois Historic Preservation Act. Reduces the number of members on the Illinois Historic Sites Advisory Council from 15 to 11 and makes other changes. Amends the School Code. Changes a reference to "Amistad Commission" to "Amistad and Freedom Trail Commission. Repeals the Local Legacy Act. Amends the Fiscal Control and Internal Auditing Act. Expands the definition of "designated State agencies" to include the Historic Preservation Agency.
Title
IHPA-AMISTAD&FREDOM TRAIL COMM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-20.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3405 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3410 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3988 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 10 | 1003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=6278&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB6278.htm |