IL HB6249 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Family and Personal Protection Act. Establishes statewide uniform standards for the issuance of permits to carry concealed firearms in this State. Vests in the Department of State Police the authority to issue concealed firearms permits to qualified applicants. Requires an applicant to complete a training course in handgun use, safety, and marksmanship. Also requires instruction in the law relating to firearm use. Creates the Citizen Safety and Self-Defense Trust Fund administered by the Department. The moneys in the Fund shall be used to administer the Act. Establishes restrictions on carrying concealed firearms. Establishes standards for the training course and for certifying instructors. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that the Family and Personal Protection Act supersedes an ordinance of a unit of local government inconsistent with that Act. Prohibits a home rule unit from regulating the issuance of permits to carry concealed firearms. Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Exempts, from an unlawful use of weapons and aggravated unlawful use of weapons violation, persons who carry or possess firearms in accordance with the Family and Personal Protection Act. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARMS-CONCEALED-PERMITS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Shane Cultra | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2010-03-05 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2010-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2010-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2010-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-02 | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-001-000 | |
2010-02-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2010-02-17 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John E. Bradley |