IL HB5986 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-08 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Deletes provision that the offense of unlawful sale or delivery of firearms includes the manufacture, sale, or delivery by a holder of a license as a dealer, importer, manufacturer, or pawnbroker under the federal Gun Control Act of 1968 to any unlicensed person a handgun having a barrel, slide, frame, or receiver which is a die casting of zinc alloy or any other nonhomogeneous metal which will melt or deform at a temperature of less than 800 degrees Fahrenheit. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-UNLAWFUL SALE FIREARMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Reginald Phillips |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 24-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5986&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5986.htm |