IL HB5947 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
If and only if Senate Bill 2925 of the 100th General Assembly becomes law (in the form in which it passed both houses), amends the Illinois Police Training Act to provide that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board may offer a school resource officer course to a qualified retired law enforcement officer. Provides that nothing in the school resource officer course provision prohibits a school resource officer or qualified retired law enforcement officer from carrying a firearm. If and only if Senate Bill 2925 of the 100th General Assembly becomes law (in the form in which it passed both houses), amends the School Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2021, a school or school district may employ a qualified retired law enforcement officer who obtains a certificate of completion or approved waiver under the Illinois Police Training Act to carry out the duties of a school resource officer. Makes a conforming change. Effective immediately or on the date Senate Bill 2925 of the 100th General Assembly takes effect, whichever is later.
Title
SRO-RETIRED LAW ENFORCMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-08-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.67 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 10.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5947&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5947.htm |