IL HB5782 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that beginning 180 days after the effective date of the bill, it is unlawful to possess, sell, offer for sale, trade, or distribute a pangolin product. Provides that unlawful possession or sale of pangolin products is a Class A misdemeanor. Defines "pangolin" and "pangolin product".
Title
CRIM CD-PANGOLIN PRODUCTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5782&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5782.htm |