IL HB5720 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish a Task Force on Computer Science Education. Sets forth provisions concerning the members of the Task Force, Task Force voting, meetings of the Task Force, support for the Task Force, reporting to the General Assembly, and dissolution of the Task Force. Requires the Task Force to (1) analyze the current state of computer science education in this State; (2) analyze current computer science education laws in other jurisdictions, both mandated and permissive; (3) identify best practices in computer science education in other jurisdictions; (4) make recommendations to the General Assembly focused on substantially increasing computer science education and the capacity of youth to obtain the requisite knowledge, skills, and practices to be educated in computer science; and (5) make funding recommendations, if the Task Force's recommendations to the General Assembly would require a fiscal commitment. Repeals these provisions on July 1, 2018. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-COMPUTER SCIENCE EDUC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 102 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0647 |
2016-07-28 | House | Effective Date July 28, 2016 |
2016-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 102-014-000 |
2016-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2016-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-26 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2016-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-003-000 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-007-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 025-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |