IL HB5719 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Employee Targeted Tax Credit Act. Provides provisions regarding: powers of the Department of Employment Security; a pilot program; a certificate of eligibility for tax credit; the tax credit, which shall not be less than $10,000 and shall not exceed $15,000; the determination of the amount of the credit; the maximum amount of credits allowed; the application for award of tax credit and a tax credit certificate; submission of tax credit certificate to the Department of Revenue; noncompliance; rules; the elimination of mandatory minimums in sentencing; and applicability. Defines terms. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Makes changes regarding appropriate dispositions; terms for Class X, Class 1, Class 2, Class 3, and Class 4 felonies; felony fines; misdemeanor sentences; and habitual criminals. Effective immediately.
Title
EMPLOYEE TARGETED TAX CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5719&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5719.htm |