IL HB5584 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cemetery Care Act. Requires every cemetery authority to choose the distribution of either of the following from a care fund: all net ordinary income; or a unitrust disbursement not exceeding 5% of the fair market value of the care fund. Requires the distribution method and the disbursement percentage selected to remain in effect unless the cemetery authority notifies the trustee and the Comptroller of its desire to effect a change. Requires a distribution from the care fund to be made on a monthly, quarterly, semiannual, or annual basis, as agreed upon by the cemetery authority and the trustee. Provides that in order to withdraw a unitrust disbursement, the fair market value of the care fund after the disbursement shall be greater than 80% of the aggregate fair market value of the care fund as of the end of the immediately preceding calendar year. Requires the trustee to pay reasonable operating expenses and taxes of the care fund itself. Provides that the provisions do not apply to a fraternal cemetery, a municipal, State, or federal cemetery, a religious cemetery, or a family burying ground.
Title
CEMETERY CARE-DISBURSEMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5584&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5584.htm |