IL HB5567 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $12,500,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for grants to the Illinois YouthBuild Coalition. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
$DHS-YOUTHBUILD
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |