IL HB5565 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Strikes a clause preventing provisions of ordinances from being invalid when they impose greater restrictions or limitations on the acquisition, possession and transfer of firearms than are imposed by this Act. Provides that regulation of the ownership and possession of firearms and related items are the exclusive powers of the State. Provides that a local government may not require registration, reporting of the sale or transfer of a firearm, or may not keep a firearms registry. Provides that any existing or future local ordinances or resolutions imposing any registration requirement on firearms and related items are invalid or void. Effective immediately.
Title
FIREARMS- MUNICIPAL REGULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] |
Rep. David Reis [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] |
Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] | Rep. Pam Roth [R] |
Rep. Adam Brown [R] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Rep. Bill Mitchell [R] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] |
Rep. Wayne Rosenthal [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Michael Unes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 65 | 13.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |