IL HB5516 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that it is a civil rights violation for any employer, employment agency, labor organization, or public employer to refuse to hire, to segregate, or to act with respect to recruitment, hiring or selection for training or apprenticeship on the basis of a prospective employee's status as unemployed.
Title
DISCRIM AGAINST UNEMPLOYED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-23 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-23 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-003-000; -FAILED |
2018-05-14 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-14 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-05-01 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 2-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5516&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5516.htm |