IL HB5472 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that during the period between July 1, 2021 and June 30, 2022, an additional 20 paid days or 100 paid hours shall be added to a provision that authorizes an annuitant to accept employment for a certain number of paid days or paid hours as a teacher without impairing his or her retirement status. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TEACHERS-RE-EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-04-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0709 |
2022-04-22 | House | Effective Date April 22, 2022 |
2022-04-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 007-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |