IL HB5396 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Biometric Privacy Information Act. Provides that if an employee brings an action against an employer under the Act, the employee's entitlement to relief shall be determined as provided in the Workers' Compensation Act. Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Provides that an action arising under the Biometric Information Privacy Act due to the actions of an employer shall be adjudicated in accordance with the Workers' Compensation Act.
Title
BIPA-WORKERS COMP-ACTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-14 | House | To Civil Procedure & Tort Liability Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 14 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 305 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5396&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5396.htm |