IL HB5287 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Revenue Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Revenue may adopt rules for payment by cryptocurrency of any amount due under any Act administered by the Department only when the Department is not required to pay a discount fee or charge to convert the cryptocurrency to United States dollars. Defines terms. Effective immediately.
Title
IDOR-CRYPTOCURRENCY
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Croke [D] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] | Rep. Jaime Andrade [D] | Sen. Mark Walker [D] |
Rep. Mark Batinick [R] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 84 N: 15 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 084-015-003 |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-02-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |