IL HB5214 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1072
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes: In provisions concerning notification of services under Section 504 of the federal Rehabilitation Act of 1973, provides that the notice shall also state that any parent who is deaf or does not typically communicate using spoken English and who participates in a Section 504 meeting with a representative of a local educational agency shall be entitled to the services of an interpreter. Removes the amendatory language that provides that those who attend a 504 meeting, a mediation session, or a due process hearing shall be entitled to the services of an interpreter. Provides that at all stages of an impartial due process hearing or mediation, the hearing officer or mediator shall require that interpreters licensed pursuant to the Interpreter for the Deaf Licensure Act of 2007 be made available by the school district for persons who are deaf or qualified interpreters be made available by the school district for persons whose normally spoken language is other than English (rather than providing that at all stages of an impartial due process hearing, the hearing officer shall require that interpreters be made available by the school district for persons who are deaf or for persons whose normally spoken language is other than English). Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-INTERPRETER-MEETINGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1072 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date June 10, 2022 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 022-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Villa |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-8.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |