IL HB5151 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Premises Liability Act. Provides that an owner or operator of a firearm range placed in operation after January 1, 1994 is immune from criminal liability and is not subject to any action for public or private nuisance or trespass arising out of or as a consequence of noise or sound emissions resulting from the normal use of the firearm range if: all areas from which a firearm may be properly discharged are at least 500 (rather than 1,000) yards from any occupied permanent dwelling on adjacent property; or the firearm range met those requirements at the time the range began its operation and subsequently an occupied permanent dwelling on adjacent property was built within 500 (rather than 1,000) yards from an area of the range from which a firearm may be properly discharged. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PREMISES LIABIL-FIREARM RANGE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 67 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 67 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1145
2013-01-18HouseEffective Date January 18, 2013
2013-01-18HouseGovernor Approved
2013-01-11HouseSent to the Governor
2013-01-07HousePassed Both Houses
2013-01-07HouseHouse Concurs
2013-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 067-046-000
2013-01-07HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 067-046-000
2013-01-07HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 007-004-000
2013-01-07HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 007-004-000
2013-01-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2013-01-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2013-01-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Andr
2013-01-04HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
2013-01-04HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
2013-01-04HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-01-04HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2013-01-04HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2013-01-04HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2013-01-04HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2013-01-04HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2013-01-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2013-01-04HouseArrived in House
2013-01-03SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-015-001
2013-01-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2013-01-03SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne
2013-01-03SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2013-01-03SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2013-01-03SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-003-001
2013-01-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2013-01-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2013-01-02SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2012-11-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 4, 2012
2012-11-29SenateSecond Reading
2012-11-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 29, 2012
2012-11-28SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 011-001-000
2012-11-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2012-11-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2012-11-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2012-11-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
2012-11-21SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2012-11-21SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013
2012-05-25SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2012-05-23SenatePostponed - Executive
2012-05-21SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mike Jacobs
2012-05-16SenatePostponed - Executive
2012-05-08SenateAssigned to Executive
2012-05-04SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012
2012-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2012-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2012-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2012-03-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2012
2012-03-22SenateArrive in Senate
2012-03-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2012-03-21HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-007-000
2012-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2012-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2012-02-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2012-02-28HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-000-000
2012-02-17HouseAssigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2012-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2012-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7401305Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5151&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5151.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5151eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5151sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5151sam002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5151enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/97/097-1145.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB5151_03212012_022000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/senate/09700HB5151_01032013_006000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB5151_01072013_005001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/97/house/09700HB5151_01072013_005000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback