IL HB5123 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall adopt rules to establish an annual basic training program schedule that provides for the monthly enrollment of recruits into basic training schools. Effective immediately.
Title
POLICE BASIC TRAINING SCHEDULE
Sponsors
Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Patrick Sheehan [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2024-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5123&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5123.htm |