IL HB5107 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago School District Article of the School Code. Repeals provisions concerning exemption from bargaining unit membership. Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. With respect to an educational employer of the Chicago school district, provides that (i) a supervisor shall be considered an "educational employee" unless the supervisor is also a managerial employee and (ii) a "managerial employee" means an individual who has a significant role in the negotiation of collective bargaining agreements or who formulates and determines employer-wide management policies and practices, including a general superintendent of schools (rather than an individual who is engaged predominantly in executive and management functions and is charged with the responsibility of directing the effectuation of such management policies and practices). In provisions concerning strikes, prohibits educational supervisors employed in the Chicago school district whose position requires an administrative license from engaging in a strike. Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
SCHOOLS-CHI-LABOR RELATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2023-01-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-007-000 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 6, 2023 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-002-000 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-11-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-035-002 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-009-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 34-8.1b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |