IL HB4998 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Removes a provision that sets forth the basic amount of the standard exemption for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 2023 and prior to December 31, 2024, and restores the cost-of-living adjustment for the basic amount that had been operative before the effective date of Public Act 103-9. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to provide for emergency rulemaking. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-STANDARD EXEMPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4998&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4998.htm |