IL HB4885 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0860
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0860
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that families with children under the age of 5 who have an open intact family services case with the Department of Children and Family Services shall be eligible for child care assistance under the Department of Humans Services' child care assistance program. Provides that eligible families shall remain eligible for child care assistance 6 months after the child's intact family services case is closed, regardless of whether the child's parents or other relatives as defined by rule are working or participating in employment or education or training programs. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD CARE-INTACT FAMILIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0860 |
2018-08-14 | House | Effective Date February 14, 2019 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 9A-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |