IL HB4553 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Circuit Courts Act to provide that: in 2021, the General Assembly shall redraw the boundaries of the subcircuits of Circuit of Cook County to reflect the results of the 2020 federal decennial census; a resident judgeship assigned to a subcircuit shall continue to be assigned to that subcircuit; and a vacancy in a resident judgeship existing on or occurring after the effective date of a law redrawing the boundaries of the subcircuits shall be filled by a resident of the redrawn subcircuit.
Title
CIR COURTS-COOK SUBCIRCUITS
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 35 | 2f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4553&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4553.htm |