IL HB4363 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Replaces some instances of annual or semi-annual reports with quarterly reports. In provisions relating to limitations on campaign contributions, removes provisions inoperative beginning July 1, 2013. Removes a reference to the dissolved Task Force on Campaign Finance Reform. Removes references to a temporary filing system effective through August 1, 2009. Removes references to specified committees and the county clerk in the Code of Fair Campaign Practices. Repeals provisions relating to contributions by a medical cannabis cultivation center or medical cannabis dispensary organization to any political action committee created by any medical cannabis cultivation center or dispensary organization to make a campaign contribution to any political committee established to promote the candidacy of a candidate or public official. Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Modifies the definition of "affiliated entity" and removes the definition of "sponsoring entity".
Title
ELEC CD/PROCUREMENT CD-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 29B-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 29B-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 29B-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 7-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-23.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-45 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 9-8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 50-37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4363&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4363.htm |