IL HB4332 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $702,514,000 to the Board of Trustees of the State Universities Retirement System for the State's contribution and $4,059,413 to the Community College Health Insurance Security Fund for the State's contribution. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$SURS/HEALTH INS-STATE CONTRIB
Sponsors
Rep. Al Riley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-10 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004 | |
2009-03-10 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-03 | First Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Al Riley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4332&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/PDF/09600HB4332.pdf |