IL HB4307 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the income tax checkoff for the U.S.S. Illinois Commissioning Fund applies for taxable years ending on or after December 31, 2015 (instead of December 31, 2014) and ending on or before December 31, 2017 (instead of December 31, 2016). Provides that the provisions creating the checkoff are repealed on December 31, 2018 (instead of December 31, 2017). Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-USS ILLINOIS CHECKOFF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-10-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-10-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 507EEE | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4307&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4307.htm |