IL HB4205 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Re-assigned to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Re-assigned to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Bottle Deposit Act. Provides that, to encourage container reuse and recycling, every beverage container sold or offered for sale to a consumer in the State must have a deposit and refund value. Includes provisions regarding: a dealer as a distributor; requirements for labels, stamps, and brand names on beverage containers; application of the Act; the commingling of beverage containers and entering into commingling agreements; unclaimed deposits for beverage containers not subject to commingling agreements; redemption centers, including licensing requirements; prohibitions on certain types of beverage containers and holders; penalties, ranging from $100 to $1,000; exceptions for beverage containers used on international flights; licensing requirements, including fees for applications; the creation of the Beverage Container Enforcement Fund; administration by the Environmental Protection Agency; the denial of redemption center licenses; the unlawful possession of beverage containers; the prohibition of glass-breaking games; and annual reporting requirements. Makes a conforming change in the State Finance Act.
Title
BOTTLE DEPOSIT ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | House | Re-assigned to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-11-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-11-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-10-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Hoan Huynh |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4205&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4205.htm |