IL HB4126 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-23)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-23)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1059
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Specifies that the maximum scholarship amount set by a qualified school is subject to the limitations provided under existing law.
Title
INVEST IN KIDS-SCHOLARSHIPS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1059 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date June 10, 2022 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 114-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2022-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2022 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 015-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 018-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2022-02-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-02-03 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-10-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2021-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2021-10-07 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-10-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-10-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2021-10-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-10-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-10-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-10-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-10-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-10-06 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-10-06 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-10-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-10-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2021-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-10-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-10-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-10-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2021-09-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | First Reading |
2021-08-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 40 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |