IL HB4126 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Provides that the fees for a new and renewal concealed carry license of an applicant who is a veteran or a qualified retired law enforcement officer shall be 50% of the fees for other applicants. Defines "qualified retired law enforcement officer" and "veteran".
Title
CONCEAL CARRY-FEES-VET&RET LAW
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4126&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4126.htm |