IL HB4125 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Revenue
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 4:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Revenue
Pending: Senate Revenue Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 4:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that the statute of limitations for the execution of a certificate of error does not apply to a certificate of error correcting an assessment to $1 when the property is used as a common area by a subdivision, association, or planned development. Makes additional technical changes.
Title
PROP TAX-CERTIFICATE OF ERROR
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-10-18 | House | First Reading |
2023-08-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margaret Croke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 14-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |