IL HB4002 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that no person who has served as a statewide elected official, the executive or administrative head of a State agency, the deputy executive or administrative head of a State agency, or a member of the General Assembly shall, within 2 years after the termination of service or employment, become a lobbyist. Defines "lobbyist".
Title
LOBBYIST-REVOLVING DOOR BAN
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. Darren Bailey [R] |
Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Brad Halbrook [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2020-02-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading |
2019-12-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-12-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-12-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Grant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4002&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4002.htm |