IL HB3944 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-16 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-16 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Requires the student member of the Board of Trustees of Community College District No. 536 to be a voting (rather than nonvoting) student member. Permits the board of trustees of any other community college district to elect to allow a student member to be a voting student member. Provides that if a board decides to terminate or not renew the employment contract of the president of a community college, then, for one year after the decision was voted upon, no person who was a member of the board at the time of the vote may be selected to serve as president of the community college. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL-VOTING STUDENT TRUSTEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-11-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-11-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 011-008-000 |
2019-11-06 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-10-29 | House | First Reading |
2019-10-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 805 | 3-7.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 3-80 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 3-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3944&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3944.htm |