IL HB3931 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on October 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Provides that potential subrecipients of grants issued by the Department of Human Services under a Notice of Funding Opportunity for the purpose of encouraging full participation in the 2020 decennial census shall be exempt from the provisions of the Act with respect to grant pre-qualification requirements and any other pre-award eligibility requirement. Repeals provisions on August 1, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GATA-CENSUS GRANT SUBRECIPIENT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-16HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-10-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-10-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-10-28HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-10-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-10-28HouseFirst Reading
2019-10-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-10-25HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30708135New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback