IL HB3773 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Smoke Detector Act. Provides that the battery for specified battery powered smoke detectors must be a self-contained long term battery if specified conditions occur. Provides that specified battery requirements do not apply to fire alarms, smoke detectors, smoke alarms, or ancillary components electronically connected to specified alarm systems; that use a low-power radio frequency wireless communication signal; that uses Wi-Fi or other Wireless Local Area Networking capability to send and receive specified notifications; or to devices as designated by the State Fire Marshal. Provides that certain smoke detector requirements do not apply to dwelling units and hotels within municipalities with a population over 1,000,000 inhabitants. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
SMOKE DETECTOR ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0200 |
2017-08-18 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2017-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-003-000 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 006-000-001 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-007-001 |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Fire & Emergency Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Fire & Emergency Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
425 | 60 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |