IL HB3773 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Smoke Detector Act. Provides that the battery for specified battery powered smoke detectors must be a self-contained long term battery if specified conditions occur. Provides that specified battery requirements do not apply to fire alarms, smoke detectors, smoke alarms, or ancillary components electronically connected to specified alarm systems; that use a low-power radio frequency wireless communication signal; that uses Wi-Fi or other Wireless Local Area Networking capability to send and receive specified notifications; or to devices as designated by the State Fire Marshal. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMOKE DETECTOR ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-23HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-26HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-003-000
2017-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2017
2017-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Public Health; 006-000-001
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-05SenateAssigned to Public Health
2017-05-02SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-02SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2017-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-02SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-28HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-007-001
2017-04-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-25HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Fire & Emergency Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Fire & Emergency Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-08HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425603Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback