IL HB3691 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-13 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that "household income" does not include wages paid to a member of the household who is a disabled person.
Title
PROP TX-SENIOR FREEZE
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Cloonen [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-06-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-03-13 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3691&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB3691.htm |