IL HB3681 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0991
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0991
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Transmitters of Money Act. Changes the definition of "transmitting money" to exclude providing payment services to a seller of goods or services, a payee, or a payment processor in connection with the sale of goods or services. Effective immediately.
Title
TRANSMITTING MONEY-DEFINITION
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-18 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0991 |
2014-08-18 | House | Effective Date August 18, 2014 |
2014-08-18 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 007-000-000 |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 20, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-028-000 |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2014-03-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Financial Institutions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-09-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 657 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |