IL HB3655 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-10-21 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts to revise statutory law to conform the statutes to the reorganization of the executive branch taking effect under Executive Order 2019-12. Makes other changes concerning the Illinois State Police and makes technical and stylistic changes. Effective immediately.
Title
ILLINOIS STATE POLICE
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Motion in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 15, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 11, 2021 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 098-000-001 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-16 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |