IL HB3475 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0381
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections concerning certificates of good conduct. Provides that "eligible offender" does not include a person who has been convicted of arson, aggravated arson, kidnapping, aggravated kidnaping, aggravated driving under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, or intoxicating compound or compounds, or any combination thereof, or aggravated domestic battery. Eliminates the exclusion from "eligible offender" of a person who has been convicted of committing or attempting to commit a Class X felony or a forcible felony. Eliminates the exclusion from "eligible offender" of a person convicted of attempting to commit any of the specified offenses. Provides that if the most serious crime of which the individual was convicted is a felony (currently, a Class 1, 2, 3, or 4 felony), the minimum period of good conduct shall be 2 years.
Title
CD CORR-CERT GOOD CONDUCT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0381 |
2015-08-17 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-014-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015 |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-001-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-04-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-023-000 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2015-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2015-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2015-03-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2015-03-10 | House | Re-assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 5-5.5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5.5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |